Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB672 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 25, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 2, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis March 18, 2021
Analysis March 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 17, 2021
Fiscal Note March 15, 2021