Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB697 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 7, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Fiscal Note March 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 31, 2021
Analysis March 20, 2021