Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB703 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 16, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021
Analysis March 17, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021