Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB707 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 707
1+By: Paxton, et al. S.B. No. 707
2+ (Lambert, Canales, Paddie, Goldman, Cyrier)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to the continuation and functions of the Credit Union
68 Department and the Credit Union Commission.
79 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
810 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 15, Finance Code, is
911 amended by adding Section 15.104 to read as follows:
1012 Sec. 15.104. NOTIFICATION AND GUIDANCE ON ADOPTION OF
1113 CERTAIN FEDERAL LAWS OR REGULATIONS. The department shall promptly
1214 notify and issue guidance to all credit unions chartered in this
1315 state on the adoption of a federal law or regulation that:
1416 (1) affects a power or authority conferred to credit
1517 unions under Section 123.003(a);
1618 (2) takes effect immediately; and
1719 (3) conflicts with state law.
1820 SECTION 2. Section 15.2041, Finance Code, is amended by
1921 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
2022 follows:
2123 (b) The training program must provide the person with
2224 information regarding:
2325 (1) the law governing department operations
2426 [legislation that created the department];
2527 (2) the programs, functions, rules, and budget of the
2628 department;
2729 (3) the scope of and limitations on the rulemaking
2830 authority of the commission;
2931 (4) the results of the most recent formal audit of the
3032 department;
3133 (5) [(4)] the requirements of:
3234 (A) laws relating to open meetings, public
3335 information, administrative procedure, and disclosing conflicts of
3436 interest; and
3537 (B) other laws applicable to members of a state
3638 policy-making body in performing their duties; and
3739 (6) [(5)] any applicable ethics policies adopted by
3840 the department or the Texas Ethics Commission[; and
3941 [(6) the basic principles and responsibilities of
4042 credit union management].
4143 (d) The commissioner shall create a training manual that
4244 includes the information required by Subsection (b). The
4345 commissioner shall distribute a copy of the training manual
4446 annually to each commission member. Each commission member shall
4547 sign and submit to the commissioner a statement acknowledging that
4648 the commission member received and has reviewed the training
4749 manual.
4850 SECTION 3. Section 15.212, Finance Code, is amended to read
4951 as follows:
5052 Sec. 15.212. SUNSET PROVISION. The Credit Union Department
5153 and the Credit Union Commission are subject to Chapter 325,
5254 Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence
5355 as provided by that chapter, the department and commission are
5456 abolished September 1, 2033 [2021].
5557 SECTION 4. Sections 15.409(b), (c), and (d), Finance Code,
5658 are redesignated as Section 15.408, Finance Code, and amended to
5759 read as follows:
5860 Sec. 15.408. CONSUMER COMPLAINTS. (a) [(b)] The
5961 department shall maintain a system to promptly and efficiently act
6062 on complaints filed with the department. The department shall
6163 maintain information about parties to the complaint, the subject
6264 matter of the complaint, a summary of the results of the review or
6365 investigation of the complaint, and its disposition.
6466 (b) [(c)] The department shall make information available
6567 describing its procedures for complaint investigation and
6668 resolution.
6769 (c) [(d)] The department shall periodically notify the
6870 complaint parties [person filing the complaint and each person who
6971 is the subject of the complaint] of the status of the complaint
7072 until final disposition unless the notice would jeopardize an
7173 investigation.
7274 SECTION 5. Subchapter E, Chapter 15, Finance Code, is
7375 amended by adding Section 15.4081 to read as follows:
7476 Sec. 15.4081. COMPLAINT TRACKING; ANNUAL STATISTICAL
7577 ANALYSIS. (a) To help identify and address regulatory issues and
7678 constraints, the department shall track all phases of the complaint
7779 and enforcement processes, including the receipt, investigation,
7880 and disposition of complaints. The department shall maintain the
7981 following information for each complaint:
8082 (1) the basis for the complaint;
8183 (2) the origin of the complaint, including whether the
8284 complaint was issued from:
8385 (A) another regulatory agency;
8486 (B) a credit union member;
8587 (C) a credit union employee;
8688 (D) a member of the public; or
8789 (E) a public or private entity;
8890 (3) the number of days taken to resolve the complaint
8991 from the date the complaint was received; and
9092 (4) the disposition of the complaint, including:
9193 (A) if no disciplinary action was taken, the
9294 reasons no disciplinary action was taken;
9395 (B) if disciplinary action was taken, the type of
9496 disciplinary action taken, including the amount of any
9597 administrative penalty or late fee;
9698 (C) if dismissed or referred to another agency,
9799 the details regarding dismissal or referral; and
98100 (D) if ongoing, the current status of the
99101 complaint.
100102 (b) The department shall annually compile a statistical
101103 analysis of the department's complaint and enforcement processes
102104 for the preceding fiscal year. The analysis must include:
103105 (1) the total number of complaints filed with the
104106 department against credit unions;
105107 (2) the number of open investigations at the end of the
106108 fiscal year;
107109 (3) the number of complaints that were resolved,
108110 disaggregated by:
109111 (A) the source of the complaint;
110112 (B) the type of alleged violation;
111113 (C) jurisdictional and non-jurisdictional
112114 complaints;
113115 (D) regulatory and nonregulatory complaints; and
114116 (E) the disposition and type of action taken,
115117 including any administrative penalty or late fee assessed; and
116118 (4) the average number of days taken to resolve a
117119 complaint, including complaints that were resolved through an
118120 examination of a credit union.
119121 SECTION 6. The heading to Section 15.409, Finance Code, is
120122 amended to read as follows:
121123 Sec. 15.409. CONSUMER INFORMATION [AND COMPLAINTS].
122124 SECTION 7. Section 122.001(d), Finance Code, is repealed.
123125 SECTION 8. The repeal of Section 122.001(d), Finance Code,
124126 by this Act applies only to articles of incorporation filed on or
125127 after the effective date of this Act. Articles of incorporation
126128 filed before the effective date of this Act are governed by the law
127129 in effect on the date the articles were filed, and the former law is
128130 continued in effect for that purpose.
129131 SECTION 9. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
130132 section, Section 15.2041, Finance Code, as amended by this Act,
131133 applies to a member of the Credit Union Commission appointed
132134 before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
133135 (b) A member of the Credit Union Commission who, before the
134136 effective date of this Act, completed the training program required
135137 by Section 15.2041, Finance Code, as that law existed before the
136138 effective date of this Act, is only required to complete additional
137139 training on the subjects added by this Act to the training program
138140 required by Section 15.2041, Finance Code. A commission member
139141 described by this subsection may not vote, deliberate, or be
140142 counted as a member in attendance at a meeting of the commission
141143 held on or after December 1, 2021, until the member completes the
142144 additional training.
143145 SECTION 10. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
144- ______________________________ ______________________________
145- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
146- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 707 passed the Senate on
147- April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
148- ______________________________
149- Secretary of the Senate
150- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 707 passed the House on
151- May 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 9, one
152- present not voting.
153- ______________________________
154- Chief Clerk of the House
155- Approved:
156- ______________________________
157- Date
158- ______________________________
159- Governor