Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB713 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 7, 2021
Analysis May 6, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021
Analysis April 2, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 30, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021