Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB730 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis May 8, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021
Analysis March 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 23, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021