Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB766 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 24, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021