Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB770 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2021
Analysis May 4, 2021
Analysis April 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 19, 2021