Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB782 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 28, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021