Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB787 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis March 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021