Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB798 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 28, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021
Analysis March 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 14, 2021