Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB799 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 16, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021
Analysis March 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021