05/24/2021 | Vetoed by the Governor | |||
05/12/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/12/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | House passage reported | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Record vote RV#898 | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Passed to 3rd reading | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 4326 | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |