1 | 1 | | 87R2343 BDP-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Menéndez S.B. No. 820 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the purchase and installation of climate control |
---|
8 | 8 | | systems at facilities operated by the Texas Department of Criminal |
---|
9 | 9 | | Justice. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "department" means the |
---|
12 | 12 | | Texas Department of Criminal Justice. |
---|
13 | 13 | | (b) The department shall: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) contract with a private entity through a |
---|
15 | 15 | | competitive bidding process to purchase and install climate control |
---|
16 | 16 | | systems at each facility operated by the department that is not |
---|
17 | 17 | | currently equipped with a climate control system capable of |
---|
18 | 18 | | maintaining the temperature in the facility at not less than 65 |
---|
19 | 19 | | degrees Fahrenheit or more than 85 degrees Fahrenheit; and |
---|
20 | 20 | | (2) install the climate control systems in the |
---|
21 | 21 | | following phases, with each phase consisting of the installation of |
---|
22 | 22 | | climate control systems at approximately one-third of the |
---|
23 | 23 | | department's facilities at a cost not to exceed $100 million per |
---|
24 | 24 | | phase: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (A) phase one to be completed not later than |
---|
26 | 26 | | December 31, 2024; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (B) phase two to be completed not later than |
---|
28 | 28 | | December 31, 2026; and |
---|
29 | 29 | | (C) phase three to be completed not later than |
---|
30 | 30 | | December 31, 2028. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (c) In conducting the competitive bidding process, the |
---|
32 | 32 | | department shall solicit bids for the entire scope of the project, |
---|
33 | 33 | | provided that the department may solicit bids for each phase of the |
---|
34 | 34 | | project if necessary or beneficial. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (d) In soliciting bids and determining the requirements for |
---|
36 | 36 | | the phased implementation of the project, the department shall: |
---|
37 | 37 | | (1) prioritize the efficient use of state resources; |
---|
38 | 38 | | and |
---|
39 | 39 | | (2) consider factors such as: |
---|
40 | 40 | | (A) the type of climate control systems needed |
---|
41 | 41 | | for each facility, including the architectural design of each |
---|
42 | 42 | | facility; |
---|
43 | 43 | | (B) the ability of any existing climate control |
---|
44 | 44 | | systems in each facility to maintain the air temperature in the |
---|
45 | 45 | | facility at not less than 65 degrees Fahrenheit or more than 85 |
---|
46 | 46 | | degrees Fahrenheit; |
---|
47 | 47 | | (C) the comparable abilities of different |
---|
48 | 48 | | climate control systems to maintain the temperature described by |
---|
49 | 49 | | Paragraph (B) of this subdivision, including the total cellblock or |
---|
50 | 50 | | dormitory square footage each system is capable of maintaining at |
---|
51 | 51 | | that temperature; and |
---|
52 | 52 | | (D) the use of inmate labor to decrease costs. |
---|
53 | 53 | | SECTION 2. This Act expires January 1, 2031. |
---|
54 | 54 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
55 | 55 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
56 | 56 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
57 | 57 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
58 | 58 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|