Senate | 04/20/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 02/26/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |