Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB839 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021