Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB841 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 17, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021