Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB855 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/09/2021

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 855
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 9, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 9, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 855 By:  Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the electronic dissemination of commercial recordings
 or audiovisual works.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 14, Business & Commerce Code, is amended by
 adding Chapter 642 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 642.  ELECTRONIC DISSEMINATION OF COMMERCIAL RECORDINGS OR
 AUDIOVISUAL WORKS
 SUBCHAPTER A.  GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 642.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Electronic dissemination" means initiating a
 transmission of, making available, or otherwise offering a
 recording or audiovisual work for distribution, display, or
 performance through the Internet or other digital network.
 (2)  "Recording or audiovisual work" means a recording
 or audiovisual work that consists of substantially all of the
 recording or work. The term does not include a recording or
 audiovisual work that is a short extract from the recording or work.
 (3)  "Website" means a set of related web pages served
 from a single web domain.  The term does not include a home page or
 channel page for the user account of a person who is not the owner or
 operator of the website on which the user home page or channel page
 appears.
 Sec. 642.002.  COMMERCIAL RECORDING OR AUDIOVISUAL WORK.
 For purposes of this chapter, a recording or audiovisual work is
 considered to be a commercial recording or audiovisual work if the
 owner, assignee, authorized agent, or licensee of the recording or
 work disseminates or intends to disseminate the recording or work
 for sale, rental, or performance or exhibition to the public,
 including under license, regardless of whether the person who
 disseminates the recording or work seeks commercial advantage or
 private financial gain from the dissemination.
 Sec. 642.003.  NO LIABILITY FOR CERTAIN PROVIDERS. This
 chapter does not impose liability on providers of an interactive
 computer service, communications service, commercial mobile
 service, or information service, including an Internet access
 service provider, an advertising network or exchange, a domain name
 registration provider, and a hosting service provider, if the
 providers provide the transmission, storage, or caching of
 electronic communications or messages of others or provide another
 related telecommunications service, a commercial mobile radio
 service, or an information service, for use by another person that
 violates this chapter.
 SUBCHAPTER B.  REQUIRED DISCLOSURES
 Sec. 642.051.  DISCLOSURE OF CERTAIN INFORMATION REQUIRED.
 (a)  An owner or operator of a website or online service that deals
 in substantial part in the electronic dissemination of third-party
 commercial recordings or audiovisual works, directly or
 indirectly, and that electronically disseminates those recordings
 or works to consumers in this state shall clearly and conspicuously
 disclose on the website or online service in a location that is
 readily accessible to a consumer using or visiting the website or
 online service, the owner or operator's true and correct:
 (1)  name;
 (2)  physical address;
 (3)  telephone number; and
 (4)  e-mail address.
 (b)  For purposes of this section, a location is considered
 readily accessible on a website or online service if the location
 is:
 (1)  a landing or home web page or screen;
 (2)  an "about" or "about us" web page or screen;
 (3)  a "contact" or "contact us" web page or screen;
 (4)  an informational web page or screen; or
 (5)  another place on the website or online service
 commonly used to display information identifying the owner or
 operator of the website or online service.
 (c)  Subsection (a) applies regardless of whether another
 person has previously electronically disseminated the same
 recording or audiovisual work.
 SUBCHAPTER C.  ENFORCEMENT
 Sec. 642.101.  DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF.
 (a)  An owner, assignee, authorized agent, or exclusive licensee of
 a commercial recording or audiovisual work electronically
 disseminated by a website or online service in violation of this
 chapter may bring a private cause of action against a person who
 violates or threatens to violate this chapter to obtain:
 (1)  a declaratory judgment; and
 (2)  permanent or temporary injunctive relief.
 (b)  Before filing an action under this section, the
 aggrieved party must provide notice to the person alleged to be in
 violation of this chapter that states:
 (1)  the person may be in violation of this chapter; and
 (2)  that failure to cure the violation before the 14th
 day after the date of receiving the notice may result in an action
 being filed against the person under this section.
 (c)  After the 14th day after the date the aggrieved party
 provides notice under Subsection (b), the aggrieved party may bring
 an action under this section in a court of competent jurisdiction.
 (d)  On motion of the party initiating the action, the court
 may make appropriate orders to compel compliance with this chapter.
 (e)  The prevailing party is entitled to recover necessary
 expenses incurred in an action under this section, including
 reasonable attorney's fees.
 Sec. 642.102.  DECEPTIVE TRADE PRACTICE; REMEDIES.  (a) A
 violation of this chapter is a false, misleading, or deceptive act
 or practice as defined by Section 17.46(b).
 (b)  The relief provided under this subchapter for a
 violation of this chapter is in addition to any remedy provided
 under other federal or state law, including Subchapter E, Chapter
 17.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 * * * * *