Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB865 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Creighton, et al. S.B. No. 865
1+By: Creighton S.B. No. 865
2+ (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2021; March 11, 2021,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
4+ April 7, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 7, 2021,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 865 By: Creighton
29
310
411 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
512 AN ACT
613 relating to a power outage alert system and a study on a statewide
714 disaster alert system.
815 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
916 SECTION 1. Chapter 411, Government Code, is amended by
1017 adding Subchapter K-1 to read as follows:
1118 SUBCHAPTER K-1. POWER OUTAGE ALERT
1219 Sec. 411.301. POWER OUTAGE ALERT. (a) With the cooperation
1320 of the Texas Department of Transportation, the Texas Division of
1421 Emergency Management, the office of the governor, and the Public
1522 Utility Commission of Texas, the department shall develop and
1623 implement an alert to be activated when the power supply in this
1724 state may be inadequate to meet demand.
1825 (b) The Public Utility Commission of Texas by rule shall
1926 adopt criteria for the content and activation of the alert
2027 described by Subsection (a). The criteria must provide for an alert
2128 to be regional or statewide.
2229 Sec. 411.302. ADMINISTRATION. (a) The director is the
2330 statewide coordinator of the power outage alert.
2431 (b) The director shall adopt rules and issue directives as
2532 necessary to ensure proper implementation of the power outage
2633 alert. The rules and directives must include the procedures to be
2734 used by the Public Utility Commission of Texas and the independent
2835 organization certified under Section 39.151, Utilities Code, to
2936 communicate with the director about the power outage alert.
3037 Sec. 411.303. DEPARTMENT TO RECRUIT PARTICIPANTS. The
3138 department shall recruit public and commercial television and radio
3239 broadcasters, private commercial entities, state or local
3340 governmental entities, the public, and other appropriate persons to
3441 assist in developing and implementing the power outage alert
3542 system.
3643 Sec. 411.304. STATE AGENCIES. (a) A state agency
3744 participating in the power outage alert system shall:
3845 (1) cooperate with the department and assist in
3946 developing and implementing the alert system; and
4047 (2) establish a plan for providing relevant
4148 information to its officers, investigators, or employees, as
4249 appropriate, once the power outage alert system has been activated.
4350 (b) In addition to its duties as a state agency under
4451 Subsection (a), the Texas Department of Transportation shall
4552 establish a plan for providing relevant information to the public
4653 through an existing system of dynamic message signs located across
4754 this state.
4855 Sec. 411.305. ACTIVATION OF POWER OUTAGE ALERT. (a) When
4956 the Public Utility Commission of Texas or an independent
5057 organization certified under Section 39.151, Utilities Code,
5158 notifies the department that the power supply in this state or a
5259 region of this state may be inadequate to meet demand, the
5360 department shall confirm the accuracy of the information and, if
5461 confirmed, immediately issue a power outage alert under this
5562 subchapter in accordance with department rules.
5663 (b) In issuing the power outage alert, the department shall
5764 send the alert to designated media outlets in this state. Following
5865 receipt of the alert, participating radio stations and television
5966 stations and other participating media outlets may issue the alert
6067 at designated intervals.
6168 Sec. 411.306. CONTENT OF POWER OUTAGE ALERT. The power
6269 outage alert must include a statement that electricity customers
6370 may experience a power outage.
6471 Sec. 411.307. TERMINATION OF POWER OUTAGE ALERT. The
6572 director shall terminate any activation of the power outage alert
6673 with respect to a particular energy emergency alert not later than
6774 the date the department receives notice that the energy emergency
6875 alert has been canceled.
6976 Sec. 411.308. LIMITATION ON PARTICIPATION BY TEXAS
7077 DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. Notwithstanding Section 411.305(b),
7178 the Texas Department of Transportation is not required to use any
7279 existing system of dynamic message signs in a statewide alert
7380 system created under this subchapter if that department receives
7481 notice from the United States Department of Transportation Federal
7582 Highway Administration that the use of the signs would result in the
7683 loss of federal highway funding or other punitive actions taken
7784 against this state due to noncompliance with federal laws,
7885 regulations, or policies.
7986 SECTION 2. (a) In this section:
8087 (1) "Alert system" means the standardized statewide
8188 disaster alert system studied under this section.
8289 (2) "Division" means the Texas Division of Emergency
8390 Management.
8491 (b) The division shall conduct a study on the efficacy of
8592 existing mass notification deployments by local governmental
8693 entities throughout this state and the feasibility of establishing
8794 a statewide disaster alert system. The study must:
8895 (1) identify the costs to local governmental entities
8996 associated with existing local disaster alert or notification
9097 systems;
9198 (2) examine the potential benefits to local
9299 governmental entities of implementing an alert system in
93100 coordination with this state, including:
94101 (A) improving this state's ability to coordinate
95102 state and local responses to disasters; and
96103 (B) eliminating barriers to successful mass
97104 notification and communication encountered by local governmental
98105 entities during disasters;
99106 (3) examine the importance of a local governmental
100107 entity's discretion regarding the entity's level and manner of
101108 participation in the alert system;
102109 (4) examine potential costs to local governmental
103110 entities or this state associated with implementing the alert
104111 system; and
105112 (5) identify any state or local governmental entity
106113 actions necessary to implement a comprehensive alert system.
107114 (c) Not later than March 1, 2022, the division shall prepare
108115 and submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the
109116 legislature a report on the findings of the study conducted under
110117 this section.
111118 (d) This section expires September 1, 2023.
112119 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
113120 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
114121 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
115122 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
116123 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
124+ * * * * *