Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB866 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+87R5088 KFF-F
12 By: Creighton S.B. No. 866
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2021; March 11, 2021, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
4- April 27, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
5- Nays 4; April 27, 2021, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
73
84
95 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
106 AN ACT
117 relating to electronic benefits transfer cards used by or for
128 recipients of benefits under certain assistance programs.
139 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1410 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
1511 amended by adding Sections 531.0911 and 531.0912 to read as
1612 follows:
1713 Sec. 531.0911. PHOTOGRAPH AND OTHER INFORMATION ON CERTAIN
1814 ELECTRONIC BENEFITS TRANSFER CARDS. (a) In this section:
1915 (1) "Financial assistance program" means the
2016 financial assistance program established under Chapter 31, Human
2117 Resources Code.
2218 (2) "Recipient" means a person who receives benefits
2319 under the financial assistance program or the supplemental
2420 nutrition assistance program.
2521 (3) "Supplemental nutrition assistance program" has
2622 the meaning assigned by Section 33.0005, Human Resources Code.
2723 (b) Subject to Subsection (d), the commission shall ensure
2824 that the front side of each electronic benefits transfer card used
2925 by a recipient or other person authorized on the recipient's
3026 account for purposes of receiving benefits under the financial
3127 assistance program or the supplemental nutrition assistance
3228 program displays:
3329 (1) the name and photograph of the recipient or other
3430 authorized person, as appropriate;
3531 (2) the words "Fraud Hotline" followed by the
3632 telephone number of the commission's toll-free hotline for
3733 reporting suspected fraud required under Section 531.108(b)(2);
3834 and
3935 (3) the Internet website address maintained by the
4036 commission for the purpose of allowing persons to report suspected
4137 fraud in either the financial assistance program or the
4238 supplemental nutrition assistance program.
4339 (c) The Department of Public Safety shall provide to the
4440 commission the photographs of a recipient and each person
4541 authorized on the recipient's account that the department has in
4642 its records. The commission shall use the photographs for purposes
4743 of complying with Subsection (b)(1). The commission and the
4844 department may enter into a memorandum of understanding for
4945 purposes of this subsection.
5046 (d) A recipient or other person authorized on the
5147 recipient's account is exempt from the photograph requirement
5248 imposed by Subsection (b) if:
5349 (1) the recipient or other authorized person is:
5450 (A) 65 years of age or older;
5551 (B) younger than 19 years of age;
5652 (C) blind;
5753 (D) disabled;
5854 (E) a victim of domestic violence;
5955 (F) homeless; or
6056 (G) issued the electronic benefits transfer card
6157 at a field, regional, or other local commission office; or
6258 (2) the Department of Public Safety does not provide a
6359 photograph of the recipient or other authorized person to the
6460 commission under Subsection (c).
6561 (e) The executive commissioner may adopt rules necessary to
6662 implement this section.
6763 Sec. 531.0912. MONITORING AND REPORTING OF ELECTRONIC
6864 BENEFITS TRANSFER CARD REPLACEMENT REQUESTS. (a) In this section
6965 "financial assistance program," "recipient," and "supplemental
7066 nutrition assistance program" have the meanings assigned by Section
7167 531.0911.
7268 (b) The commission shall monitor the frequency with which
7369 recipients request replacements of their electronic benefits
7470 transfer cards used for purposes of receiving benefits under the
7571 financial assistance program or the supplemental nutrition
7672 assistance program. Not later than December 1 of each year, the
7773 commission shall submit a report regarding that frequency to the
7874 standing committees of the house of representatives and the senate
7975 with jurisdiction over the financial assistance and supplemental
8076 nutrition assistance programs.
8177 SECTION 2. Section 730.007(c), Transportation Code, is
8278 amended to read as follows:
8379 (c) This section does not:
8480 (1) prohibit the disclosure of a person's photographic
8581 image to:
8682 (A) a law enforcement agency, the Texas
8783 Department of Motor Vehicles, a county tax assessor-collector, or a
8884 criminal justice agency for an official purpose;
8985 (B) an agency of this state investigating an
9086 alleged violation of a state or federal law relating to the
9187 obtaining, selling, or purchasing of a benefit authorized by
9288 Chapter 31 or 33, Human Resources Code; [or]
9389 (C) an agency of this state investigating an
9490 alleged violation of a state or federal law under authority
9591 provided by Title 4, Labor Code; or
9692 (D) the Health and Human Services Commission for
9793 use on an electronic benefits transfer card as required by Section
9894 531.0911, Government Code; or
9995 (2) prevent a court from compelling by subpoena the
10096 production of a person's photographic image.
10197 SECTION 3. Notwithstanding Section 531.0911, Government
10298 Code, as added by this Act, the Health and Human Services
10399 Commission:
104100 (1) is not required to issue electronic benefits
105101 transfer cards that comply with that section until September 1,
106102 2022, but is required to begin issuing cards that comply with that
107103 section beginning on that date; and
108104 (2) shall ensure that on or before August 31, 2024,
109105 each electronic benefits transfer card used to deliver benefits to
110106 recipients under the financial assistance program under Chapter 31,
111107 Human Resources Code, or the supplemental nutrition assistance
112108 program under Chapter 33, Human Resources Code, conforms to Section
113109 531.0911, Government Code, as added by this Act.
114110 SECTION 4. Notwithstanding Section 531.0912, Government
115111 Code, as added by this Act, the Health and Human Services Commission
116112 shall submit the first report required by that section not later
117113 than December 1, 2022.
118114 SECTION 5. If before implementing any provision of this Act
119115 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
120116 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
121117 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
122118 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
123119 waiver or authorization is granted.
124120 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
125- * * * * *