Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB873 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 30, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 3, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis March 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2021
Bill March 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note March 15, 2021