Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB885 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021