Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB89 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 89
1+By: Menéndez, et al. S.B. No. 89
2+ (González of El Paso)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to supplemental information required for inclusion with a
68 written statement of an individualized education program developed
79 for certain public school students who received special education
810 services during the 2019-2020 or 2020-2021 school year.
911 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1012 SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as the COVID-19 Special
1113 Education Recovery Act.
1214 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
1315 amended by adding Section 29.0052 to read as follows:
1416 Sec. 29.0052. INDIVIDUALIZED EDUCATION PROGRAM SUPPLEMENT.
1517 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), for each child who was
1618 enrolled in a school district's special education program under
1719 this subchapter during the 2019-2020 school year or the 2020-2021
1820 school year, the district shall prepare a supplement to be included
1921 with the written statement of the individualized education program
2022 developed for the child under Section 29.005(b). The supplement
2123 must include information indicating:
2224 (1) if applicable, whether the written report of the
2325 child's full individual and initial evaluation under Section 29.004
2426 was completed during the 2019-2020 school year or the 2020-2021
2527 school year and, if so, whether the report was completed by the date
2628 required under that section;
2729 (2) if applicable, whether the child's initial
2830 individualized education program was developed under Section
2931 29.005(b) during the 2019-2020 school year or the 2020-2021 school
3032 year and, if so, whether the program was developed by the date
3133 required under 34 C.F.R. Section 300.323(c)(1);
3234 (3) whether the provision of special services to the
3335 child under an individualized education program during the
3436 2019-2020 school year or the 2020-2021 school year was interrupted,
3537 reduced, delayed, suspended, or discontinued; and
3638 (4) whether compensatory educational services are
3739 appropriate for the child based on the information under
3840 Subdivisions (1)-(3) or any other factors.
3941 (b) Subsection (a) does not apply to a child if during the
4042 2020-2021 school year the written statement of the child's
4143 individualized education program documents the information
4244 described under Subsections (a)(1)-(4).
4345 (c) Section 29.005(f) and Section 29.0051 do not apply to a
4446 supplement prepared for inclusion with a written statement of an
4547 individualized education program, as required by this section.
4648 (d) The commissioner may adopt rules as necessary to
4749 implement this section.
4850 (e) This section expires September 1, 2023.
4951 SECTION 3. Not later than May 1, 2022, a school district
5052 subject to Section 29.0052, Education Code, as added by this Act,
5153 shall complete each required supplement to a written statement of
5254 an individualized education program, as provided by that section.
5355 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
5456 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
5557 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
5658 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
5759 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
58- ______________________________ ______________________________
59- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
60- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 89 passed the Senate on
61- April 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
62- ______________________________
63- Secretary of the Senate
64- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 89 passed the House on
65- May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 2, one present
66- not voting.
67- ______________________________
68- Chief Clerk of the House
69- Approved:
70- ______________________________
71- Date
72- ______________________________
73- Governor