Senate | 03/29/2021 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Local Government | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |