House | 04/06/2021 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Amended | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |