Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB910 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 910
1+87R24802 MCK-F
2+ By: Schwertner S.B. No. 910
3+ (Frank)
4+ Substitute the following for S.B. No. 910: No.
25
36
7+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
48 AN ACT
59 relating to a study of options for implementing family preservation
610 services, the provision of certain other health and human services
711 by certain state agency contractors, and the repeal of a prior pilot
812 program for family-based safety services.
913 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1014 SECTION 1. Subchapter B-1, Chapter 264, Family Code, is
1115 amended by adding Section 264.1691 to read as follows:
1216 Sec. 264.1691. STUDY OF OPTIONS FOR IMPLEMENTING FAMILY
1317 PRESERVATION SERVICES. (a) In this section, "family preservation
1418 service" means a time-limited, family-focused service, including:
1519 (1) a service subject to the Family First Prevention
1620 Services Act (Title VII, Div. E, Pub. L. No. 115-123), provided to
1721 the family of a child who is:
1822 (A) a candidate for foster care to prevent or
1923 eliminate the need to remove the child and to allow the child to
2024 remain safely with the child's family; or
2125 (B) a pregnant or parenting foster youth;
2226 (2) enhanced in-home support services and
2327 non-recurring financial support to promote safe and stable
2428 families; and
2529 (3) services to promote self-sufficiency and prevent
2630 further need for interaction in the child welfare system.
2731 (b) The department shall study and develop a comprehensive
2832 list of options for implementing family preservation services in
2933 existing catchment areas, including:
3034 (1) contracting with single source continuum
3135 contractors to provide services; and
3236 (2) procuring service providers through a competitive
3337 bidding process.
3438 (c) In developing the options under Subsection (b), the
3539 department shall:
3640 (1) examine existing department functions related to
3741 the stage of service the department describes as family-based
3842 safety services, including assessments of child safety and child
3943 removals, and make recommendations for incorporating the functions
4044 into a contracted model;
4145 (2) consider the results from community needs
4246 assessments and capacity development plans conducted during the
4347 preceding 10 years; and
4448 (3) consider:
4549 (A) contingent on appropriation, including Title
4650 IV-E prevention services in the delivery of community-based family
4751 preservation services and the appropriate use of those services;
4852 (B) the financial modeling used to determine
4953 implementation costs, including:
5054 (i) start-up funding costs;
5155 (ii) the cost of purchased client services;
5256 (iii) strategies for shared financial risk;
5357 and
5458 (iv) rate methodology;
5559 (C) procedures for transitioning between case
5660 stages, including transitions from:
5761 (i) investigation to family preservation;
5862 and
5963 (ii) family preservation to foster care;
6064 (D) ways to maximize evidence-based services and
6165 to increase the evidence base for family preservation programs in
6266 this state;
6367 (E) requirements for complying with federal law
6468 to receive matching funds for certain prevention services;
6569 (F) appropriate performance measures for
6670 contracted services, including associated financial remedies and
6771 incentives;
6872 (G) ways to incorporate and to maximize existing
6973 funding methods for and programs related to behavioral health and
7074 substance use provided by the Health and Human Services Commission;
7175 (H) appropriate contract provisions to ensure a
7276 clear distinction of money, personnel, and processes for family
7377 preservation services and foster care services;
7478 (I) conflict resolution procedures between the
7579 department and contractors concerning:
7680 (i) service plans;
7781 (ii) services; and
7882 (iii) case action for children or families
7983 served by a contractor;
8084 (J) appropriate oversight structures to manage
8185 contract compliance, contractor performance, and child and family
8286 safety;
8387 (K) appropriate contract provisions to ensure
8488 community engagement, including appropriate partnerships with
8589 faith-based organizations;
8690 (L) recommendations for statutory changes
8791 necessary to support the department's implementation options; and
8892 (M) any other information the department
8993 determines necessary for legislative direction of the department's
9094 implementation of community-based family preservation services.
9195 (d) In developing implementation options under this
9296 section, the department shall:
9397 (1) incorporate relevant information obtained from
9498 previous efforts and similar service models implemented in other
9599 states;
96100 (2) collaborate with the Health and Human Services
97101 Commission as needed, including on:
98102 (A) recommendations for the provision of
99103 behavioral health and substance use services; and
100104 (B) appropriate rate methodology; and
101105 (3) allow interested persons to comment on the
102106 provision of behavioral health and substance use services.
103107 (e) The department may enter into any contracts the
104108 department determines necessary to comply with this section.
105109 (f) This section expires August 31, 2023.
106110 SECTION 2. The following laws are repealed:
107111 (1) Section 264.169, Family Code; and
108112 (2) Section 40.0581(f), Human Resources Code.
109113 SECTION 3. Not later than October 1, 2022, the Department of
110114 Family and Protective Services shall submit copies of the options
111115 described by Section 264.1691, Family Code, as added by this Act,
112116 along with any associated recommendations, to the:
113117 (1) governor;
114118 (2) lieutenant governor;
115119 (3) speaker of the house of representatives;
116120 (4) House Committee on Appropriations;
117121 (5) Senate Committee on Finance;
118122 (6) House Committee on Human Services; and
119123 (7) Senate Committee on Health and Human Services.
120124 SECTION 4. The Department of Family and Protective Services
121125 is required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
122126 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
123127 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
124128 purpose, the department may, but is not required to, implement a
125129 provision of this Act using other appropriations that are available
126130 for that purpose.
127131 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
128132 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
129133 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
130134 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
131135 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
132- ______________________________ ______________________________
133- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
134- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 910 passed the Senate on
135- April 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
136- the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
137- following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
138- ______________________________
139- Secretary of the Senate
140- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 910 passed the House, with
141- amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 139,
142- Nays 8, two present not voting.
143- ______________________________
144- Chief Clerk of the House
145- Approved:
146- ______________________________
147- Date
148- ______________________________
149- Governor