Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB912 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 18, 2021