Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB917 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 2, 2021