Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB918 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 28, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 31, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 22, 2021