Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB922 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 28, 2021
Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis March 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021