Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB952 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 24, 2021