Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB957 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 2, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021
Analysis March 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021