Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB965 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021
Analysis March 31, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 31, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 31, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021