Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR1 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021