Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR11 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 3, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021