Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR21 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 29, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021