Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR22 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 29, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 28, 2021