Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR26 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021