Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR32 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/20/2021

                            By: Hughes, Hall S.C.R. No. 32
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; April 1, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture & Rural
 Affairs; April 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The Northeast Texas Trail is a 130-mile-long
 converted rail corridor, stretching from Farmersville through 19
 rural towns and 7 counties to New Boston; and
 WHEREAS, Since 2012, the Northeast Texas Trail Coalition has
 advocated for turning this previously unused land into a
 comprehensive system of parks, paths, and protected natural areas;
 under the group's vision, the NETT will be the longest pedestrian,
 bicycle, and equestrian trail in Texas, and it will link population
 centers, public facilities, and neighborhoods across the region;
 and
 WHEREAS, The construction of the NETT is expected to help
 revitalize the communities along the trail's route, many of which
 are severely disadvantaged; according to a 2014 economic impact
 assessment, the project is a low-cost investment that will create
 jobs, increase tourism, conserve valuable land, and bolster
 property values; furthermore, studies show that when citizens have
 access to safe and well-maintained outdoor spaces that can be used
 for recreation, relaxation, and exercise, their overall quality of
 life is improved; and
 WHEREAS, The development of the Northeast Texas Trail is
 likely to have a positive impact on the health, welfare, and
 economic prosperity of the region's rural communities, and the
 possibility of making it a part of the Texas Parks and Wildlife
 system should be explored; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 87th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby request the lieutenant governor and the speaker of the House
 of Representatives to direct the appropriate house and senate
 committees to conduct an interim study regarding the feasibility of
 integrating the Northeast Texas Trail into the state park system;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the studies identify next steps in planning
 and changes required in state statutes, agency administrative
 rules, and local ordinances, and that the committees consider in
 their studies management and governance issues and coordination, as
 well as the initial and ongoing resources needed to fully
 incorporate the NETT into the state park system; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the committees submit full reports, including
 findings and recommendations, to the 88th Legislature no later than
 December 31, 2022.
 * * * * *