05/15/2021 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/04/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/04/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | House passage reported | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |