|
06/07/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/20/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
House passage reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Record vote RV#1261
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Laid before the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Placed on Resolutions Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|