Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR42 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/26/2021

                            S.C.R. No. 42


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The Legislature of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Trooper Moises Sanchez, who died on
 August 24, 2019, at the age of 49; and
 WHEREAS, A treasured Texan and a highly esteemed law
 enforcement officer, Moises Sanchez is remembered for his rewarding
 life of service to his fellow citizens and for his strength, his
 courage, and his many contributions to his community and state; and
 WHEREAS, Moises Sanchez served his country with distinction
 in the United States Marine Corps from 1989 to 1993, and he had a
 successful 18-year career with FedEx; he went on to join the Texas
 Department of Public Safety, and he served as a state trooper for
 more than four years; he earned a reputation for excellence in the
 field of law enforcement, and he was greatly respected and admired
 by his colleagues; and
 WHEREAS, On April 6, 2019, Trooper Sanchez sustained two
 gunshot wounds while serving in the line of duty in Edinburg, Texas,
 and he passed away as a result of his injuries nearly five months
 later; Trooper Sanchez was posthumously honored as a recipient of
 the 2019 Star of Texas Award in recognition of his sacrifice and
 service as a first responder; and
 WHEREAS, Throughout his career in law enforcement, Moises
 Sanchez demonstrated uncommon bravery and fortitude and an
 exceptional commitment to public service; he was also a devoted
 husband to his wife, Yvonne, and a devoted father to his three
 children, Zachary, Zebastian, and Zoey; it is truly fitting that
 the Texas Legislature honor his life and his invaluable service to
 the citizens of Texas; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 87th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Moises Sanchez and extend sincere
 condolences to his family; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this resolution be prepared in honor
 and in memory of Moises Sanchez.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 42 was adopted by the Senate
 on April 6, 2021, by a rising vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 42 was adopted by the House
 on April 23, 2021, by a rising vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor