Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR53 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2021

                    S.C.R. No. 53


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever treasure their
 memories of Andrew George Khoury of Longview, who died on
 August 24, 2019, at the age of 50; and
 WHEREAS, A fifth-generation Texan, Andy Khoury was born in
 Longview on May 20, 1969, to Dorothy and Alvin Khoury, and he grew
 up with a brother, Samuel; after graduating from Longview High
 School in 1987, he earned his bachelor's degree cum laude from
 Southern Methodist University in 1991, and he went on to earn his
 law degree from Baylor University in 1994; admitted to the bar that
 same year, he was sworn in by his father, Judge Alvin Khoury; and
 WHEREAS, After clerking for the firms of Jones, Jones & Curry
 in Marshall and Brown McCarroll & Oaks Hartline in Longview during
 and immediately after law school, Mr. Khoury began his legal career
 at the firm of Nichols & Nichols in Longview, where he demonstrated
 his expertise in state and federal litigation, including personal
 injury cases as well as complex commercial, insurance, and oil and
 gas cases; he opened the Khoury Law Firm in 2012, focusing on
 business litigation, wills, trusts, and probate cases; and
 WHEREAS, A leader in his profession, Mr. Khoury served the
 Gregg County Bar Association as president, and he helped organize
 an effort to bring the Supreme Court of Texas to conduct oral
 arguments in Longview; he was a member of the State Bar of Texas and
 served on its Judiciary Relations Committee, and he was also a
 member of the Northeast Texas Bar Association, the Eastern District
 of Texas Bar Association, and the Phi Delta Phi International Legal
 Honor Society-Hemphill Inn; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Khoury gave back to his beloved hometown through
 his service with the Longview ISD Foundation, as vice chair of the
 City of Longview Historic Preservation Commission, and as a judge
 on the Longview Teen Court; he was a Paul Harris Fellow in the
 Rotary Club of Longview, and he was active with the CHRISTUS Good
 Shepherd Foundation, the Greater Longview United Way, and the
 Longview Chamber of Commerce; he was also an active member of the
 alumni associations of SMU and Baylor Law; and
 WHEREAS, In his leisure time, Mr. Khoury delighted in
 traveling with his family to Florida and Maine, and he was a
 passionate supporter of the Longview Lobo and SMU football teams;
 in addition, he was devoted to his two dogs, Leo and Lucy; and
 WHEREAS, A widely respected attorney and a proud son of
 Longview, Andy Khoury lived a life that was rich in personal and
 professional achievements, and he has left behind a record of
 service that his loved ones can remember with pride; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 87th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Andrew George Khoury and extend
 heartfelt sympathy to his family and many friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Andy Khoury.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 53 was adopted by the Senate
 on May 19, 2021, by a rising vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 53 was adopted by the House
 on May 26, 2021, by a rising vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor