Senate | 04/23/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Administration | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |