Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR58 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/21/2021

                            By: Campbell S.J.R. No. 58
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2021; March 24, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 1; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment to prohibit a person from
 being placed on a ballot as a candidate for public office if the
 person has an outstanding financial obligation payable to the Texas
 Ethics Commission.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article XVI, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 2-a to read as follows:
 Sec. 2-a.  Notwithstanding any other provision of this
 constitution, a person is ineligible to be placed on a ballot as a
 candidate for public office if on the date the person files to be
 placed on the ballot the person has an outstanding financial
 obligation payable to the Texas Ethics Commission.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 87th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2021, to prohibit a person from being placed on a
 ballot as a candidate for public office if the person has an
 outstanding financial obligation payable to the Texas Ethics
 Commission.
 (b)  Section 2-a, Article XVI, of this constitution takes
 effect January 1, 2022, and applies only to an election the filing
 period for which begins on or after that date.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 2, 2021.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment prohibiting a person
 from being placed on a ballot as a candidate for public office if
 the person has an outstanding financial obligation payable to the
 Texas Ethics Commission."
 * * * * *