Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR251 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/14/2021

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 251
 In Memory
 of
 Rodney Clyde Denton
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the
 citizens of Rotan in mourning the loss of Rodney Clyde Denton,
 who died October 26, 2020, at the age of 55; and
 WHEREAS, A native of Fort Rucker, Alabama, Rodney Denton
 was born on January 23, 1965, to Rodney and Emma Denton; he
 graduated from Rotan High School in 1983; and
 WHEREAS, Rodney married Tracie Pritchard Denton, his
 beloved wife, on February 16, 1991; they were blessed with two
 beautiful children, Samuel and Ryleigh, who enriched his life
 immeasurably; and
 WHEREAS, An esteemed public servant, Rodney served the
 City of Rotan for 37 years; he began his career with the city as a
 worker on the garbage trucks, and he served in a variety of
 positions and rose steadily through the ranks to become the
 city's director of public works; and
 WHEREAS, He served the community for many years through his
 work with the Rotan Fire Department and the emergency medical
 services team, and he served as a member of the Fisher County
 Child Welfare Board and the board of the Rotan Independent School
 District; and
 WHEREAS, A loving husband and father and a cherished friend
 to many, Rodney Denton was a treasured member of the Rotan
 community, and he will long be remembered with respect and
 admiration by all who were privileged to share in his life; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Rodney Clyde Denton; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Rodney Clyde Denton.
 Springer
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on April 14, 2021, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate