Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR429 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 429
 In Memory
 of
 Angela Farias
 WHEREAS, Countless lives were touched by the kindness and
 generosity of Angela Maria Farias of San Antonio, who passed away
 on January 8, 2020, at the age of 70; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Laredo on February 16, 1949, the former
 Angie Rodriguez was the daughter of Felipe and Jane Rodriguez;
 she grew up with two brothers, Phillip and David, and graduated
 from McCollum High School; later, she joined the staff of the
 Harlandale Independent School District, and she loved working at
 her alma mater, where her sweet smile and sunny disposition
 brightened the days of colleagues and students alike; and
 WHEREAS, She married Joe Farias on July 18, 1970, and they
 became the parents of four treasured sons, Gabriel, Joey, Daniel,
 and Jaime; while her children were young, she encouraged them in
 all their athletic activities, taking many weekend road trips to
 cheer them on, and their friends were also beneficiaries of her
 motherly care and affection; she later took pride in becoming a
 grandmother, and she delighted in attending her grandchildren's
 events, from school carnivals and plays to sports competitions
 and award ceremonies; eventually, she knew the joy of becoming a
 great-grandmother as well; and
 WHEREAS, Dedicated to her South Side community, Ms. Farias
 was active in civic life, and she enthusiastically supported her
 husband's endeavors during his tenure in the Texas House of
 Representatives; he credited her with making him a better public
 servant, and he liked to assert that she was actually the bigger
 vote-getter; ever pleased to further expand the definition of
 family, she welcomed his office staff into the fold; she was
 commissioned as a Yellow Rose of Texas by Governor Ann Richards;
 and
 WHEREAS, Angie Farias lived a life that was rich in family,
 friends, and community engagement, and those who were privileged
 to share in her love and affection will forever hold her close in
 their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Angela Maria
 Farias and extend sincere condolences to the members of her
 family: to her husband, the Honorable Joe Farias; to her sons,
 Gabriel Farias and his wife, Katie, Joey Farias Jr. and his wife,
 Athena, Daniel Farias, and Jaime Farias and his wife, JoAna; to
 her grandchildren, Niya, Xzavier, Analyssa, Joey, Gia, Nicholas,
 Noah, Christian, Jasmine, and Elijah; to her
 great-grandchildren, Eano, Braylon, and Chanel; to her father,
 Felipe Rodriguez; to her brothers, Phillip and David Rodriguez;
 and to her other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Angie Farias.
 Gutierrez
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 20, 2021, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate