Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR513 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2021

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 513
 In Memory
 of
 Stephen Jones
 WHEREAS, Sergeant Stephen Jones of the Concho County
 Sheriff's Office was killed in the line of duty on May 10, 2021,
 at the age of 34, and the tragic passing of this exemplary officer
 is a tremendous loss to his family, his department, and his
 community; and
 WHEREAS, Born in San Angelo on July 9, 1986, Stephen Jones
 was the son of Doug and Nola Jones; he grew up with the
 companionship of four brothers, James, Mark, David, and Daniel,
 and three sisters, Marie, Teresa, and Sarah, and he graduated
 from his homeschool program in 2005; setting his sights on a
 career in law enforcement, he earned his basic peace officer
 certification from the Concho Valley Council of Governments; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Jones joined the force as a deputy with the
 Concho County Sheriff's Office; well-liked and widely admired in
 his community, he impressed his fellow citizens with his
 kindness, his cheerful demeanor, and his willingness to lend a
 helping hand whenever he was needed; to his colleagues in the
 sheriff's office, he was like family, and after his untimely
 death, his department vowed to honor his legacy by retiring his
 badge and unit number; and
 WHEREAS, Sergeant Jones shared a rewarding marriage with
 the love of his life, Rebekah Jones, whom he wed on May 28, 2005;
 a devoted father, he deeply cherished his five children, Tyrel,
 Kimber, Dakota, Grace, and Katie; in addition to spending time
 with his loved ones, he enjoyed being outdoors, and he took great
 pleasure in ranching, hunting, and shooting; and
 WHEREAS, Embodying the highest ideals of the law
 enforcement profession, Sergeant Stephen Jones served his
 community and his state with compassion, integrity, and honor,
 and although he is gone, his dedication and sacrifice will never
 be forgotten; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Sergeant Stephen
 Jones and extend heartfelt condolences to the members of his
 family: to his wife, Rebekah Jones; to his children, Tyrel Jones,
 Kimber Jones, Dakota Jones, Grace Jones, and Katie Jones; to his
 parents, Doug and Nola Jones; to his siblings, James Jones, Mark
 Jones, Marie Jones, David Jones, Teresa Jones, Daniel Jones, and
 Sarah Jones; to his father- and mother-in-law, Thomas and Tammy
 Coder; and to his many other relatives and friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Sergeant Stephen Jones.
 Perry
 Alvarado Hancock Nichols Alvarado Hancock Nichols
Alvarado Hancock Nichols
 Bettencourt Hinojosa Paxton Bettencourt Hinojosa Paxton
Bettencourt Hinojosa Paxton
 Birdwell Huffman Powell Birdwell Huffman Powell
Birdwell Huffman Powell
 Blanco Hughes Schwertner Blanco Hughes Schwertner
Blanco Hughes Schwertner
 Buckingham Johnson Seliger Buckingham Johnson Seliger
Buckingham Johnson Seliger
 Campbell Kolkhorst Springer Campbell Kolkhorst Springer
Campbell Kolkhorst Springer
 Creighton Lucio Taylor Creighton Lucio Taylor
Creighton Lucio Taylor
 Eckhardt Menéndez West Eckhardt Menéndez West
Eckhardt Menéndez West
 Gutierrez Miles Whitmire Gutierrez Miles Whitmire
Gutierrez Miles Whitmire
 Hall Nelson Zaffirini Hall Nelson Zaffirini
Hall Nelson Zaffirini
 Patrick, President of the Senate
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 28, 2021, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate

Alvarado Hancock Nichols

Bettencourt Hinojosa Paxton

Birdwell Huffman Powell

Blanco Hughes Schwertner

Buckingham Johnson Seliger

Campbell Kolkhorst Springer

Creighton Lucio Taylor

Eckhardt Menéndez West

Gutierrez Miles Whitmire

Hall Nelson Zaffirini