1 | 1 | | By: Howard H.B. No. 183 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 6 | | relating to the establishment of the task force on asylum-seeking |
---|
7 | 7 | | migrants. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 403, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
10 | 10 | | adding Subchapter R to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SUBCHAPTER R. TASK FORCE ON ASYLUM-SEEKING MIGRANTS |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 403.501. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (1) "Asylum-seeking migrant" means a person who is |
---|
14 | 14 | | seeking asylum in the United States and who has been released into a |
---|
15 | 15 | | community in this state by: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (A) the Office of Refugee Resettlement; |
---|
17 | 17 | | (B) United States Customs and Border Protection |
---|
18 | 18 | | or United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, pending an |
---|
19 | 19 | | immigration hearing; |
---|
20 | 20 | | C) the Department of Public Safety; or |
---|
21 | 21 | | (D) any other state or federal law enforcement |
---|
22 | 22 | | agency stationed at the border. |
---|
23 | 23 | | (2) "Task force" means the task force on |
---|
24 | 24 | | asylum-seeking migrants. |
---|
25 | 25 | | Sec. 403.502. ESTABLISHMENT; PURPOSES. The task force on |
---|
26 | 26 | | asylum-seeking migrants is established to: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (1) study the humanitarian and fiscal impacts of the |
---|
28 | 28 | | presence of asylum-seeking migrants in this state related to: |
---|
29 | 29 | | (a) public education and school districts; |
---|
30 | 30 | | (b) open-enrollment charter schools; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (c) institutions of higher education; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (d) the provision of health and human services |
---|
33 | 33 | | and child protection; |
---|
34 | 34 | | e) the Texas Workforce Commission; |
---|
35 | 35 | | f) the Texas Department of Criminal Justice as |
---|
36 | 36 | | well as the Texas Juvenile Justice Department, issues studied by |
---|
37 | 37 | | the Task Force shall include, but is not limited to, information |
---|
38 | 38 | | pertaining to: |
---|
39 | 39 | | (f-1) human trafficking; |
---|
40 | 40 | | (f-2) sex trafficking; and |
---|
41 | 41 | | (f-3) sexual assault; or |
---|
42 | 42 | | (g) other areas the Task Force determines to be |
---|
43 | 43 | | relevant in the production of the report. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (2) produce a report outlining the status of |
---|
45 | 45 | | asylum-seeking migrants in this state and distribute that report to |
---|
46 | 46 | | state officials. |
---|
47 | 47 | | Sec. 403.503. COMPOSITION. The task force is composed of |
---|
48 | 48 | | twelve members to be appointed by the comptroller as follows: |
---|
49 | 49 | | (1) one representative of a faith-based organization |
---|
50 | 50 | | providing direct services to asylum-seeking migrants in this state; |
---|
51 | 51 | | (2) one representative of a community-based |
---|
52 | 52 | | organization providing direct services to asylum-seeking migrants |
---|
53 | 53 | | in this state; |
---|
54 | 54 | | (3) one member who is a superintendent of a school |
---|
55 | 55 | | district from the border region of Texas; |
---|
56 | 56 | | (4) one representative of a law enforcement agency; |
---|
57 | 57 | | (5) one representative of the Texas Education Agency; |
---|
58 | 58 | | (6) one representative of the Health and Human |
---|
59 | 59 | | Services Commission; |
---|
60 | 60 | | (7) one representative of the comptroller; |
---|
61 | 61 | | (8) one representative of the Texas Higher Education |
---|
62 | 62 | | Coordination Board; |
---|
63 | 63 | | (9) one representative of the Texas Department of |
---|
64 | 64 | | Criminal Justice; |
---|
65 | 65 | | (10) one representative of the Texas Juvenile Justice |
---|
66 | 66 | | Department; and |
---|
67 | 67 | | (11) one member from the Texas House and Texas Senate |
---|
68 | 68 | | who represent a region of the border. |
---|
69 | 69 | | Sec. 403.504. MEETINGS. (a) The task force shall meet at |
---|
70 | 70 | | least three times each year and may hold additional meetings in |
---|
71 | 71 | | person or by conference call if necessary. |
---|
72 | 72 | | (b) Section 551.125 applies to a meeting held by conference |
---|
73 | 73 | | call under this section, except that Section 551.125(b) does not |
---|
74 | 74 | | apply. |
---|
75 | 75 | | Sec. 403.505. COMPENSATION. A member of the task force may |
---|
76 | 76 | | not receive compensation for service on the task force. |
---|
77 | 77 | | Sec. 403.506. REPORT. (a) Using funds available to the |
---|
78 | 78 | | task force under Section 403.507, the task force shall partner with |
---|
79 | 79 | | an independent third party to produce a report outlining the status |
---|
80 | 80 | | of asylum-seeking migrants in this state. |
---|
81 | 81 | | (b) The task force shall submit the report to the governor, |
---|
82 | 82 | | lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and |
---|
83 | 83 | | comptroller no later than December 1, 2022 and December 31, 2023. |
---|
84 | 84 | | Sec. 403.507. GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS. The |
---|
85 | 85 | | comptroller may accept on behalf of the task force a gift, grant, or |
---|
86 | 86 | | donation from any source to carry out the purposes of this |
---|
87 | 87 | | subchapter. Notwithstanding any other provision of this |
---|
88 | 88 | | subchapter, the comptroller is not required to convene the task |
---|
89 | 89 | | force to produce the report if sufficient private gifts, grants, or |
---|
90 | 90 | | donations are not available. |
---|
91 | 91 | | Sec. 403.508. EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and |
---|
92 | 92 | | this subchapter expires January 1, 2024. |
---|
93 | 93 | | SECTION 2. (a) Not later than December 31, 2021, the |
---|
94 | 94 | | comptroller of public accounts shall, subject to Section 403.507, |
---|
95 | 95 | | Government Code, as added by this Act, convene the task force |
---|
96 | 96 | | required under Subchapter R, Chapter 403, Government Code, as added |
---|
97 | 97 | | by this Act. |
---|
98 | 98 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
99 | 99 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
100 | 100 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
101 | 101 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
102 | 102 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|