Senate | 07/16/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 07/13/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 07/13/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 07/13/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 07/13/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 07/13/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 07/13/2021 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 07/13/2021 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 07/12/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 07/12/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 07/10/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 07/10/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 07/10/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 07/08/2021 | Referred to Jurisprudence | ||
Senate | 07/08/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 07/08/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 07/08/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |